Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1050086 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1050086



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 145
09.03.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 2
09.03.1999 Description International Searching Authority 13
09.03.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 2
09.03.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.07.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 19
22.07.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
06.08.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
20.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 20
21.08.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
14.10.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.11.1999 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.01.2000 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
09.02.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
09.02.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.02.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
11.04.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.04.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.04.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
11.04.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
28.04.2000 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
22.07.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.07.2000 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
22.07.2000 Annex Search / examination 4
27.09.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.02.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
28.02.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.02.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.06.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.07.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
28.09.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
28.09.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.09.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.03.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.04.2002 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
27.05.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
28.02.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.07.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1