blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1050086 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1050086



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 145
25.07.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
28.02.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
27.05.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.04.2002 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
14.03.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.09.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.09.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
28.09.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.07.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
23.06.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.02.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.02.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.02.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
27.09.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.07.2000 Annex Search / examination 4
22.07.2000 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
22.07.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.04.2000 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
11.04.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
11.04.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
11.04.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.04.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.02.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.02.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.02.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
25.01.2000 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
02.11.1999 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.08.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
20.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 20
06.08.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.07.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
22.07.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 19
09.03.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
09.03.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 2
09.03.1999 Description International Searching Authority 13
09.03.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 2