blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1050086
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1050086Global Dossier 24.04.2002B1
EP1050086 08.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE9900155 19.01.1999
DE19802038 21.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT216803T 15.05.2002T
Priority number Date
DE9900155 19.01.1999
DE19802038 21.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2318253 29.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE9900155 19.01.1999
DE19802038 21.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59901294D 29.05.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE9900155 19.01.1999
DE59901294 19.01.1999
DE19802038 21.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6468683 22.10.2002B1
Priority number Date
DE9900155 19.01.1999
DE19802038 21.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9938223Global Dossier 29.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19802038 21.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19802038 22.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19802038 21.01.1998