Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050086

EP1050086 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A DIRECT METHANOL FUEL CELL WITH GASEOUS FUEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
Former [2002/28]For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH
Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse
52425 Jülich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MENZER, Reinhard
Siemensstrasse 35
D-52428 Jülich / DE
02 / HÖHLEIN, Bernd
Korbweg 4
D-52441 Linnich / DE
[2000/45]
Application number, filing date99904724.419.01.1999
[2000/45]
WO1999DE00155
Priority number, dateDE199810203821.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19802038
[2000/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9938223
Date:29.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1050086
Date:08.11.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050086
Date:24.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/04, H01M8/00, H01M8/10
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINER DIREKT-METHANOL-BRENNSTOFFZELLE MIT GASFÖRMIGEM BRENNSTOFF[2000/45]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A DIRECT METHANOL FUEL CELL WITH GASEOUS FUEL[2000/45]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ACTIONNER UNE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE METHANOL DIRECTE AVEC UN COMBUSTIBLE GAZEUX[2000/45]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2000National basic fee paid 
28.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
28.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2001Fee for grant paid
28.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI24.04.2002
IT24.04.2002
NL24.04.2002
DK24.07.2002
SE24.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
[2008/17]
Former [2004/40]FI24.04.2002
NL24.04.2002
DK24.07.2002
SE24.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
Former [2004/05]NL24.04.2002
DK24.07.2002
SE24.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
Former [2003/46]NL24.04.2002
DK24.07.2002
SE24.07.2002
Former [2003/10]NL24.04.2002
SE24.07.2002
Former [2002/42]SE24.07.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH08321320  ;
 [Y]WO9750140  (PANTEL KURT ;LUFT GUENTER (DE); SIEMENS AG (DE); WAIDHAS MANFRED () [Y] 1,4,6 * figures 1,2; claims 1,3-5 * * page 5, line 16 - line 23 * * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 26 *;
 [Y]JPH05343085  ;
 [A]JPS63237363  ;
 [A]JPH04249865
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 097, no. 004, & JP08321320 A 19961203 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 97-074681, XP002106503 [Y] 1,3,4,6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - SCOTT K ET AL, "PERFORMANCE AND MODELLING OF A DIRECT METHANOL SOLID POLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (19970301), vol. 65, no. 1/02, pages 159 - 171, XP002044891 [Y] 1,6 * page 160, column R, paragraph 3; figure 4 * * page 168, column L, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(97)02485-3
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940322), vol. 018, no. 167, Database accession no. (E - 1528), & JP05343085 A 19931224 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 3 * abstract *
 [A]  - SHUKIA A K ET AL, "VAPOUR-FEED DIRECT-METHANOL FUEL CELL WITH PROTON-EXCHANGE MEMBRANE ELECTROLYTE", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (19950501), vol. 55, no. 1, pages 87 - 91, XP000541735 [A] 1 * page 88, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-7753(94)02150-2
 [A]  - SCHMIDT V M ET AL, "DEMS AND SINGLE CELL MEASUREMENTS OF A DIRECT METHANOL FUEL CELL", ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY PROCEEDINGS, (19951001), vol. 95, no. 23, pages 267 - 277, XP002044890 [A] 1
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890127), vol. 013, no. 038, Database accession no. (E - 709), & JP63237363 A 19881003 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930114), vol. 017, no. 022, Database accession no. (E - 1307), & JP04249865 A 19920904 (AISIN AW CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *