Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973687

EP0973687 - ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.12.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thielow, Frank
Rosenweg 23
88285 Bodnegg / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Roth, Klaus
Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Grosstobeler Strasse 39
88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Roth, Klaus
Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39
88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE
Former [2000/04]Roth, Klaus
Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler, Karlstrasse 8
88212 Ravensburg / DE
Application number, filing date99904727.722.01.1999
[2000/04]
WO1999DE00165
Priority number, dateDE199810272124.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19802721
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9937570
Date:29.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973687
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:B66C1/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:IN DIE TRAGSÄULE INTEGRIERTE ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN SPINDELSAUFZUG[2000/04]
English:ELEVATOR[2000/04]
French:ASCENSEUR[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase24.09.1999National basic fee paid 
24.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
10.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/04]
09.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200204   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2002
Cited inInternational search[XA]DE19618080  (FISCHOETTER PETER DR ING [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,12,16,18 * column 1, line 29 - line 34 * * column 1, line 43 - line 53 * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 8 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3,5,7-11,13-15,17;
 [XA]US4051923  (BLANCHETTE LIONEL, et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 18 * * figure 2 * [A] 2,3,5-18