Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0970322 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0970322



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 204
10.08.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.08.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.07.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
10.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.05.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
06.05.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
26.04.2004 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 1
08.04.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.04.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
08.04.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
21.11.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
21.11.2003 Description Search / examination 2
21.11.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
21.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.10.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.09.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.06.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
06.06.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.07.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
29.05.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.05.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
24.05.2002 Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee Search / examination 1
06.03.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
28.03.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
26.03.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
08.03.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
06.03.2001 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
25.05.2000 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
04.04.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.03.2000 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 1
20.03.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.10.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
12.10.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 21
20.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 30
12.08.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
27.07.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.07.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 23
30.03.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
30.03.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 2
30.03.1999 Description International Searching Authority 15
30.03.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 4