Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0970322


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
30.06.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2006  [2006/31]
12.08.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.09.2005  [2005/39]
20.08.2004 (Expected) grant published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
11.08.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.08.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.04.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.02.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.10.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.06.2003 First examination report
04.06.2003 Examination report or reply
22.01.2003 Renewal fee
19.07.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
19.07.2002 Renewal fee
21.05.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
21.05.2002 Renewal fee
13.05.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
13.05.2002 Renewal fee
04.03.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
21.03.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
06.03.2001 Renewal fee
01.03.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
24.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  10.05.2000 [2000/19]
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
05.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
26.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
06.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
17.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
24.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication