Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0970322
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001520731Global Dossier 30.10.2001A
Priority number Date
ITTO980071 28.01.1998
EP9900302 18.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0970322Global Dossier 06.10.2004B1
EP0970322 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
ITTO980071 28.01.1998
EP9900302 18.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69920818T 08.12.2005T2
DE69920818D 11.11.2004D1
Priority number Date
ITTO980071 28.01.1998
EP9900302 18.01.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9939119Global Dossier 05.08.1999A1
Priority number Date
ITTO980071 28.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9904812 23.05.2000A
Priority number Date
ITTO980071 28.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ITTO980071 28.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
ITTO980071 28.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2236623 20.09.2004C2
Priority number Date
ITTO980071 28.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW582466U 01.04.2004U
Priority number Date
ITTO980071 28.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6135152 24.10.2000A
Priority number Date
ITTO980071 28.01.1998