Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970322

EP0970322 - SEQUENTIAL MIXING PLATE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEVIPI A.G.
Aeulestrasse 5 Postfach 83 Triesen
FL-9490 Vaduz / LI
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
GEVIPI A.G.
Aeulestrasse 5 Postfach 83 Triesen
FL-9490 Vaduz / LI
Inventor(s)01 / KNAPP, Alfons
Klockstrasse 15
D-88400 Biberach / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Patrito, Pier Franco
Cabinet PATRITO BREVETTI
Via Don Minzoni 14
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Patrito, Pier Franco, Dr. Ing.
Cabinet PATRITO BREVETTI Via Don Minzoni 14
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date99904797.018.01.1999
[2000/02]
WO1999EP00302
Priority number, dateIT1998TO0007128.01.1998         Original published format: IT TO980071
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939119
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970322
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970322
Date:06.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16K11/074
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:SEQUENTIELLER MISCHPLATTENSCHIEBER[2000/02]
English:SEQUENTIAL MIXING PLATE VALVE[2000/02]
French:ROBINET MELANGEUR SEQUENTIEL[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase13.10.1999National basic fee paid 
13.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
06.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2004Fee for grant paid
23.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR06.10.2004
IT06.10.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2006/31]FR06.10.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]FR629821  (CUNIGEL CHARLES) [X] 1,4,7,11 * figures 7-10 *;
 [X]EP0063627  (ROSENTHAL TECHNIK AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,7,11 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2217610  (CHANTOISEAU ROBINETTERIE [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 3-5 *;
 [A]EP0304529  (CASA BUADES SA [ES]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *
by applicantIT722831
 IT1191205