Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996799

EP0996799 - PIVOTAL CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DORMA GmbH + Co. KG
Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48
58256 Ennepetal / DE
[2000/18]
Inventor(s)01 / FINKE, Andreas
Taubenstrasse 32
D-58285 Gevelsberg / DE
[2000/18]
Application number, filing date99904868.908.02.1999
[2000/18]
WO1999EP00808
Priority number, dateDE199810485909.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19804859
[2000/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940280
Date:12.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996799
Date:03.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996799
Date:02.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/14]
Search report(s)International search reportEP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:E05D1/06
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/18]
TitleGerman:SCHWENKBARE VERBINDUNG[2000/18]
English:PIVOTAL CONNECTION[2000/18]
French:LIAISON PIVOTANTE[2000/18]
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999National basic fee paid 
09.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
11.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2002Fee for grant paid
11.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US3060492  (WERNER DELLITH) [A] 1 * column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * column 2, line 26 - line 34; figure - *;
 [A]DE4303784  (FLUOROWARE INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 58 - column 6, line 30; figure - *
by applicantDE9419652U
    - firmenkatalog der firma schueco international, page 55,