Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975483

EP0975483 - FUEL TANK EQUIPPED WITH A DEVICE COMMUNICATING ITS UPPER PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.01.2002
Database last updated on 22.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2002First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM
19, avenue Jules Carteret
69007 Lyon / FR
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / ARNAL, André
Lotissement La Garenne
F-38290 Frontonas / FR
02 / DECOBERT, Philippe
37, rue Bequerelle
F-60120 Paillart / FR
03 / ROSSEEL, Alexis
14, avenue des Martyrs de la Liberté
F-60200 Compiegne / FR
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Leszczynski, André
Cabinet Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Leszczynski, André
NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99904911.719.02.1999
[2000/05]
WO1999FR00378
Priority number, dateFR1998000201519.02.1998         Original published format: FR 9802015
[2000/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9942317
Date:26.08.1999
Language:FR
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975483
Date:02.02.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60K15/035
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:KRAFTSTOFFTANK MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBINDUNG SEINER TANKDOME[2000/05]
English:FUEL TANK EQUIPPED WITH A DEVICE COMMUNICATING ITS UPPER PARTS[2000/05]
French:RESERVOIR A CARBURANT MUNI D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN COMMUNICATION DE SES PARTIES HAUTES[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase27.10.1999National basic fee paid 
27.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
10.01.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/10]
04.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[DA]DE3040160  (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * page 3, line 17 - line 22 * * page 4, line 1 - line 7 * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 3; figure - *;
 [A]EP0758579  (SOLVAY [BE]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 27; figure - *;
 [A]EP0624447  (RP TOPLA LIMITED [JP]) [A] 2,3 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0623779  ;
 [A]JPH0623779  (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 3 * figure - *;
 [A]US3917109  (MACDONALD DONALD C) [A] 5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940426), vol. 018, no. 229, Database accession no. (M - 1598), [A] 3 * abstract *
by applicantDE3040160