Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979350

EP0979350 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE MULTIPOINT INJECTION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JOHNSON CONTROLS AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS
18, Chaussée Jules César
95520 Osny / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/04]For all designated states
Johnson Controls Automotive Electronics
18, Chaussée Jules César
95520 Osny / FR
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
SAGEM S.A.
6, Avenue d'Iéna
75016 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ESTEVENON, Christine, Sagem S.A.
Etablissement de Pontoise 18 chaussée Jules César
F-95520 Osny / FR
02 / TRINTIGNAC, Henri, Sagem S.A.
Le Ponant de Paris, 27, rue Leblanc
F-75512 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Fruchard, Guy
Cabinet Boettcher
16, Rue Médéric
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Fruchard, Guy
Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2002/44]Fruchard, Guy
CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/07]Fort, Jacques
CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date99904943.024.02.1999
[2000/07]
WO1999FR00412
Priority number, dateFR1998000234526.02.1998         Original published format: FR 9802345
[2000/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9943940
Date:02.09.1999
Language:FR
[1999/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979350
Date:16.02.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979350
Date:09.04.2003
Language:FR
[2003/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/38, F02D41/24
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2000/07]
TitleGerman:MEHRPUNKTEINSPRITZUNGSEINHEIT FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR[2000/07]
English:INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE MULTIPOINT INJECTION MODULE[2000/07]
French:MODULE D'INJECTION MULTI-POINTS POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase26.10.1999National basic fee paid 
26.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
28.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2003Fee for grant paid
10.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0487198  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [Y] 1,5-7 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 53 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 4 * * column 7, line 4 - line 34 * * figure 2 *;
 [Y]JPH07238857  ;
 [A]WO9209957  (WEBER U S A INC [US]) [A] 1-3,6,7 * page 2, line 23 - page 4, line 12 * * page 5, line 13 - page 7, line 20 * * page 8, line 3 - line 19 * * page 10, line 5 - line 23 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]EP0488362  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3-5 * column 2, line 1 - line 30 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 26 * * column 8, line 37 - column 9, line 45 * * column 12, line 58 - column 14, line 26 * * figures 1,3,8,13-15 *;
 [A]US4895124  (BARTHOLOMEW DONALD D [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2 * * column 1, line 7 - line 47 * * column 3, line 13 - line 40 *;
 [A]EP0512357  (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 3 - line 30 * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 46 * * figure - *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 096, no. 001, [Y] 1,5-7 * abstract *