Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055075

EP1055075 - BLIND RIVET CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.12.2004  [2004/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAE Systems PLC
P.O. Box 87
Warwick House
Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough
Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
BAE SYSTEMS plc
Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BROWN, David Martyn
British Aerospace Airbus Ltd.i, Broughton
Nr. Chester, Clwyd CH4 0DR / GB
[2000/48]
Application number, filing date99905063.615.02.1999
[2000/48]
WO1999GB00478
Priority number, dateGB1998000331418.02.1998         Original published format: GB 9803314
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9942734
Date:26.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055075
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055075
Date:10.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/50]
Search report(s)International search reportEP26.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16B19/10
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/48]
TitleGerman:BLINDNIETARTIGES VERBINDUNGSELEMENT[2000/48]
English:BLIND RIVET CONNECTOR[2000/48]
French:CONNECTEUR A RIVET AVEUGLE[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase03.08.2000National basic fee paid 
03.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
18.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2003Fee for grant paid
13.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2721967  (ETUDE DEV INDL TECHNOL [FR]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 2; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE1286812  (HONSEL NIETEN & METALLWARENFAB) [A] 1,2,4-6 * column 3, line 30 - line 38; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4919578  (ZEIGLER HENRY J [US], et al) [A] 1,3-6 * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 17; figures 1-11 *