EP1068386 - DEVICE FOR WIRELESS CONTROL OF A SEWING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shad, Philip 77-79 High Street Ruislip Middlesex HA4 8JL / GB | For all designated states Valsan, Constantin 35 Etchingham Court, Etchingham Park Road London, N3 2EA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Shad, Philip 77-79 High Street Ruislip, Middlesex HA4 8JL / GB | ||
For all designated states Valsan, Constantin 35 Etchingham Court, Etchingham Park Road London, N3 2EA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/03] | Application number, filing date | 99905098.2 | 19.02.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999GB00519 | Priority number, date | GB19980007025 | 02.04.1998 Original published format: GB 9807025 | GB19980019955 | 15.09.1998 Original published format: GB 9819955 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951807 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068386 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1068386 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D05B69/18, D05B69/36 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
D05B69/36 (EP);
D05B69/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRAHTLOSEN STEUERUNG EINER NÄHMASCHINE | [2001/03] | English: | DEVICE FOR WIRELESS CONTROL OF A SEWING MACHINE | [2001/03] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE SANS FIL POUR MACHINE A COUDRE | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 13.09.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 17.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.12.2002 | BE | 11.12.2002 | CH | 11.12.2002 | FI | 11.12.2002 | FR | 11.12.2002 | GR | 11.12.2002 | IT | 11.12.2002 | LI | 11.12.2002 | NL | 11.12.2002 | CY | 19.02.2003 | IE | 19.02.2003 | LU | 19.02.2003 | MC | 28.02.2003 | DK | 11.03.2003 | PT | 11.03.2003 | SE | 11.03.2003 | DE | 12.03.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/04] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
FR | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
CY | 19.02.2003 | ||
IE | 19.02.2003 | ||
LU | 19.02.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2003 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
DE | 12.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
FR | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
CY | 19.02.2003 | ||
LU | 19.02.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2003 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
DE | 12.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
FR | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
CY | 19.02.2003 | ||
LU | 19.02.2003 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
DE | 12.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
FR | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
LU | 19.02.2003 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
DE | 12.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/34] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
FR | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
DE | 12.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
DE | 12.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
DE | 12.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 11.12.2002 | |
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 11.12.2002 | |
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 11.03.2003 | |
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 11.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5950792 ; | [A]JPS5795191 ; | [A]US4332208 (WATASUE TOSHIAKI, et al); | [X]US4976552 (ISHIKAWA SATORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 45 - line 68 * * column 2, line 37 - line 68 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 50 *; | [X]US5247449 (YOSHIDA NORIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, lines 5-10 * * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, lines 36-39 * * column 8, line 32 - line 33; claims 6,9 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840703), vol. 008, no. 142, Database accession no. (E - 254), & JP59050792 A 19840323 (RICCAR SEWING MACHINE KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820918), vol. 006, no. 182, Database accession no. (E - 131), & JP57095191 A 19820612 (RITSUKAA KK) [A] * abstract * |