Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1058234

EP1058234 - VIDEO SIGNAL PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2006/45]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HAMADA, Masanori
35-33, Nozato-cho
Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-0079 / JP
02 / MASUDA, Hiroshi
7-2-501, Motoyamakitamachi 3-chome Higashinada-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 658-0003 / JP
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date99905224.418.02.1999
[2000/49]
WO1999JP00706
Priority number, dateJP1998003698219.02.1998         Original published format: JP 3698298
[2000/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9942989
Date:26.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1058234
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1058234
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:G09G5/18, H04N5/66, H04N5/14
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/49]
TitleGerman:VIDEOSIGNALPROZESSOR[2000/49]
English:VIDEO SIGNAL PROCESSOR[2000/49]
French:PROCESSEUR DE SIGNAUX VIDEO[2000/49]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2000Translation filed 
19.09.2000National basic fee paid 
19.09.2000Search fee paid 
19.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
19.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
11.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2006Fee for grant paid
15.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0749236  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 12,13 * column 5, line 50 - column 10, line 3; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]EP0807923  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 12,13 * abstract * * column 10, line 8 - column 11, line 10 * * column 13, line 47 - column 14, line 47 *
International search[A]JPH07212616  ;
 [A]JPH1026953  ;
 [A]JPH02124691  ;
 [A]JPH01270470  ;
 [X]JPH0822276