Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1058234 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1058234



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 277
14.10.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
12.09.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.10.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.09.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.09.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
15.09.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
15.09.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 36
23.05.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.05.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.05.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
22.05.2006 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
12.05.2006 General enquiry Search / examination 1
03.05.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
03.05.2004 Description Search / examination 5
03.05.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.02.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
11.02.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.12.2003 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.11.2003 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.09.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.08.2002 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.08.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
09.07.2002 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.07.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
04.07.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.07.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
23.01.2002 General enquiry Search / examination 1
25.10.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.08.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.08.2000 Claims Search / examination 8
18.08.2000 Claims Search / examination 8
18.08.2000 Description Search / examination 30
18.08.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.08.2000 Drawings Search / examination 12
18.08.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.08.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.07.2000 Translation of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
17.02.2000 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
07.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 28
02.09.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.08.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
18.08.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 34