Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1058234


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.10.2008 Change - applicant published on  19.11.2008  [2008/47]
14.09.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.10.2007  [2007/42]
06.10.2006 (Expected) grant published on  08.11.2006  [2006/45]
22.09.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.09.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.05.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.03.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.03.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.05.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.03.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.02.2004 First examination report
07.02.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.03.2003 Renewal fee
05.07.2002 Supplementary search report published on  21.08.2002  [2002/34]
21.03.2002 Renewal fee
08.03.2001 Renewal fee
21.10.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
21.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
27.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
12.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
04.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
09.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
27.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
24.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication