Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037258

EP1037258 - MERCURY-FREE METAL HALIDE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  19.09.2017
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2017Revocation of patentpublished on 25.10.2017  [2017/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation
1-201-1 Funakoshi-cho
Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-8510 / JP
[2017/11]
Former [2013/23]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation
1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho
Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken 237-8510 / JP
Former [2011/03]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
Harison Toshiba Lighting Corp.
5-2-1 Asahi-machi Imabari-shi
Ehime 794-8510 / JP
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAHASHI, Kiyoshi
30-23, Miyukihigashimachi
Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-0055 / JP
02 / HORIUCHI, Makoto
106-2-412, Ohdono
Sakurai-shi Nara 633-0062 / JP
03 / TAKEDA, Mamoru
5-2-1-6, Hikaridai Seikacho
Soraku-gun Kyoto 619-0237 / JP
04 / SAITO, Takeshi
5-59-1-403, Higashisonodacho
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0953 / JP
05 / KIRYU, Hideaki Matsushitadenshikogyo Shosetsuryo
35-22, Gunkeshinmachi
Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1136 / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2000/38]Barnfather, Karl Jon, Dr. , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date99905225.117.02.1999
[2000/38]
WO1999JP00713
Priority number, dateJP1998003841720.02.1998         Original published format: JP 3841798
JP1998026115316.09.1998         Original published format: JP 26115398
JP1998026464918.09.1998         Original published format: JP 26464998
[2000/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9943020
Date:26.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037258
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037258
Date:15.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:H01J61/20
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/38]
TitleGerman:QUECKSILBERFREIE METALLHALOGENIDLAMPE[2000/38]
English:MERCURY-FREE METAL HALIDE LAMP[2000/38]
French:LAMPE A IODURES METALLIQUES EXEMPTE DE MERCURE[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase22.11.1999Translation filed 
25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Search fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/38]
20.03.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: EURO-PCT translation(s) not filed
02.11.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2009Fee for grant paid
02.03.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.01.2010  22.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
OSRAM GmbH
Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
 [2015/34]
Former [2013/16]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2010  22.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
OSRAM GmbH
Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Much, Florian
Epping Hermann Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Ridlerstraße 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2013/09]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2010  22.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
OSRAM GmbH
Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Much, Florian
Epping Hermann Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Ridlerstraße 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2012/29]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2010  22.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
OSRAM AG
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Much, Florian
Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstraße 55
D-80339 München / DE
Former [2010/08]
Opponent(s)01  14.01.2010   
Osram Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Much, Florian
Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstraße 55
D-80339 München / DE
25.02.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.10.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.03.2012Date of oral proceedings
18.04.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.06.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/43]
11.09.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition15.06.2012Appeal received No.  T1440/12
14.08.2012Statement of grounds filed
27.06.2017Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
27.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
18.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
20.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200406   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0399288  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,11 * claims 1,2 *;
 [PX]EP0883160  (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY [JP]) [PX] 1 * claims 1-12 *;
 [X]EP0583122  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, lines 46-57; claims 1,2 *;
 [X]US4757236  (DAKIN JAMES T [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, lines 53-67; claims 1-6 *;
 [X]US4023059  (ANDERSON SCOTT) [X] 1 * claims 1-5,8,9 *;
 [A]JPS56126244  ;
 [A]US4709184  (KEEFFE WILLIAM M [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [AD]JPH0684496  ;
 [A]SU1737562  (SARANSKOE PROIZV OB LISMA [SU], et al);
 [A]GB1449703  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 1 * claims 6-11 *;
 [A]US5256940  (WADA SHIGEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 11 * claims 1,2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811225), vol. 005, no. 205, Database accession no. (E - 088), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940623), vol. 018, no. 332, Database accession no. (E - 1567), [AD] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH05205697  (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH);
 [A]JPS554857  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO)
ExaminationUS3681218
 EP0762476