blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1037258 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1037258



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1654
19.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.09.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
14.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.09.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
11.09.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.09.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.07.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
05.07.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
05.07.2017 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
13.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.06.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.05.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
19.05.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
24.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.04.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
08.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.02.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
08.02.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
08.02.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
08.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.02.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 10
03.02.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.02.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 2
02.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.02.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 1
01.12.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
11.04.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.07.2015 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
14.07.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
16.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.07.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
15.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.05.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.03.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
07.03.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 33
22.11.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
03.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.08.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
07.05.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
07.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
30.04.2013 Claims Appeal 6
30.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.04.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.04.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.04.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.04.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
26.04.2013 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 1
16.04.2013 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Appeal 2
08.04.2013 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 2
19.03.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
19.03.2013 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 3
25.01.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
22.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.01.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
10.01.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
09.01.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
03.01.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 18
03.01.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
14.12.2012 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
11.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.12.2012 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
05.10.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.08.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.08.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 32
29.06.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
15.06.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
15.06.2012 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
15.06.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
06.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.06.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 1
06.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.06.2012 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 2
26.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.04.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 11
18.04.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
18.04.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.04.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 26
18.04.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
18.04.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.04.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.04.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
18.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
18.04.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 12
10.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
01.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
01.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.10.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.10.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 12
21.10.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.09.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.12.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
16.11.2010 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 3
03.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.10.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 43
22.10.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 22
22.10.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.10.2010 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 13
25.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.08.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.08.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.08.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.06.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.06.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.02.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.02.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.02.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 130
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.01.2010 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
14.01.2010 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
14.01.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 53
14.01.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 53
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
14.01.2010 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
19.03.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.03.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.03.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.03.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
02.03.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.03.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.11.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.11.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
03.11.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.10.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
17.10.2008 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
16.10.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 6
04.01.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
04.01.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.11.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
02.11.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
02.11.2006 Description Search / examination 8
02.11.2006 Description Search / examination 8
14.08.2006 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
02.08.2006 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.07.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.07.2006 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
24.03.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.08.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
09.08.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
07.08.2000 Request for re-establishment of rights allowed Search / examination 1
25.05.2000 Annex Search / examination 31
25.05.2000 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.05.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.05.2000 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 8
19.05.2000 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 46
26.04.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.04.2000 Claims Search / examination 6
26.04.2000 Description Search / examination 30
26.04.2000 Drawings Search / examination 13
26.04.2000 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
20.04.2000 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 52
20.03.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn ((part of) translation not filed) Search / examination 1
15.10.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
07.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 24
07.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 24
07.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 22
02.09.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.08.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
19.08.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 49