EP1081379 - CONTROL VALVE FOR VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 2-1, Toyoda-cho, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMURA, Kazuya Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aicha-ken 448-8671 / JP | 02 /
KAYUKAWA, Hiroaki Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/10] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99905271.5 | 23.02.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999JP00786 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0050775 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081379 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/00, F04B53/10, F04B27/18 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
F04B27/1804 (EP);
F04B2027/1854 (EP);
F04B2027/1859 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/10] | F04B49/00, F04B53/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2001/10] | Title | German: | REGELVENTIL FÜR EINEN KOMPRESSOR MIT VERÄNDERLICHER VERDRÄNGUNG | [2001/10] | English: | CONTROL VALVE FOR VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT COMPRESSOR | [2001/10] | French: | VANNE DE REGLAGE A DEPLACEMENT VARIABLE POUR COMPRESSEUR | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2000 | Translation filed | 19.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2006 | Observations by third parties | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 23.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH04119271 (SAGINOMIYA SEISAKUSHO INC, et al); | [Y]JPH0942510 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JPS61145141U | by applicant | JPH04119271 | other | JPH06346843 | JPH06346843K | JPS56120873 | JPS56120873K | JPH04350372 | JPH04350372K | - JAPAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, MARUZEN CO., LTD., JSME mechanical engineers' handbook, (19870415), pages B5-204 - B5-205, ISBN 4-88898-057-8, XP002997811 * Original in JP (2 pg-s+covers), EN translation incl. * |