Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1056929

EP1056929 - ROTARY-PISTON MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.07.2005  [2005/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Twin Technology AS
Haakon VII's gt. 10 Vika
0161 Oslo / NO
[2004/39]
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
Vading Motor AS
P.O. Box 59
8001 Bodoe / NO
Inventor(s)01 / VADING, Kjell
Nedre Lagard Terasse 13
N-8012 Bodoe / NO
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Onn, Thorsten , et al
Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 23101
104 35 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Onn, Thorsten , et al
AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA, Zacco & Bruhn, Box 23101
104 35 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date99905373.919.02.1999
[2000/49]
WO1999NO00060
Priority number, dateNO1998000078325.02.1998         Original published format: NO 980783
NO1999000036426.01.1999         Original published format: NO 990364
[2000/49]
Filing languageNO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9943926
Date:02.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1056929
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1056929
Date:21.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE02.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:F01C1/344, // F04C2:344
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/49]
TitleGerman:ROTATIONSKOLBENMASCHINE[2000/49]
English:ROTARY-PISTON MACHINE[2000/49]
French:MACHINE A PISTON ROTATIF[2000/49]
Entry into regional phase02.09.1999Translation filed 
19.09.2000National basic fee paid 
19.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
19.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
23.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2004Fee for grant paid
18.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200305   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2003
29.02.200406   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US3537432  (JORDAAN BAREND DANIEL);
 [X]US3747573  (FOSTER B);
 [X]US4061450  (CHRISTY CHARLES A);
 [Y]US1661593  (BODKER ALBERT J)