Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1058565

EP1058565 - IMPLANTABLE DRUG INFUSION DEVICE HAVING A SAFETY VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.04.2004  [2004/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
7000 Central Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis MN 55432-3576 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/50]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WEIJAND, Koen, J.
Moerbeistraat 73
NL-3235 EG Rockanje / NL
02 / HALLER, Markus
24, route de Burtigny
CH-1268 Begnins / CH
[2000/50]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/50]Hughes, Andrea Michelle , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99905577.501.02.1999
[2000/50]
WO1999US02083
Priority number, dateUS1998001719502.02.1998         Original published format: US 17195
[2000/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9938551
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1058565
Date:13.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2000/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1058565
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/142, A61M5/14
[2000/50]
Designated contracting statesDE [2000/50]
TitleGerman:IMPLANTIERBARE INFUSIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SICHERHEITSVENTIL[2003/04]
English:IMPLANTABLE DRUG INFUSION DEVICE HAVING A SAFETY VALVE[2000/50]
French:DISPOSITIF IMPLANTABLE SERVANT A ADMINISTRER UN MEDICAMENT PAR PERFUSION ET POSSEDANT UN CLAPET DE SURETE[2000/50]
Former [2000/50]IMPLANTIERBARE INFUSIONSVORRICTUNG MIT EINEM SICHERHEITSVENTIL
Entry into regional phase01.09.2000National basic fee paid 
01.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.09.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
01.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2002Fee for grant paid
12.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0387439  (SHILEY INFUSAD INC) [X] 1,2,12,16,17,27 * column 4, line 54 - column 8, line 30; figures 1,2A,3 * [A] 18;
 [XA]EP0450186  (LAGUETTE) [X] 1,2 * column 8, line 15 - column 12, line 45; figures 1,3,5 * [A] 9,10,17;
 [A]US5277556  (VAN LINTEL) [A] 2,4-6,10-12,14,17,19-21,24,25,27,29 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0039124  (INFUSAID)