Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053392

EP1053392 - COMBINED CRYOGENIC AIR SEPARATION WITH INTEGRATED GASIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Energy (USA), LLC
4200 Wildwood Parkway
Atlanta, GA 30339 / US
[2010/36]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION
2000 Westchester Avenue
White Plains, New York 10650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JAHNKE, Frederick, C.
2 Winthrop Street
Rye, NY 10650 / US
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Bedford, Grant Richard
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/09]Bedford, Grant Richard
Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2008/50]Thomas, Simon , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
Former [2006/37]Green, Mark Charles , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
Former [2002/41]Rees, Alexander Ellison , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
Former [2000/47]Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
Application number, filing date99905691.403.02.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999US02335
Priority number, dateUS19980073686P04.02.1998         Original published format: US 73686 P
US1999024192302.02.1999         Original published format: US 241923
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940304
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053392
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053392
Date:08.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:F02B43/00, F01K23/06, F25J3/04
[2003/22]
Former International [2000/47]F02B43/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:KOMBINIERTER SEPARATOR FÜR TIEFGEKÜHLTE LUFT UND INTEGRIERTEM VERDAMPFER[2000/47]
English:COMBINED CRYOGENIC AIR SEPARATION WITH INTEGRATED GASIFIER[2000/47]
French:SEPARATION D'AIR CRYOGENIQUE COMBINEE AVEC UNE GAZEIFICATION INTEGREE[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2000National basic fee paid 
24.07.2000Search fee paid 
24.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
23.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2008
13.06.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
17.06.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
28.07.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
06.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2010Fee for grant paid
06.08.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.09.2011  21.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour L'étude et L'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Opponent's representative
Mercey, Fiona Susan
L'Air Liquide SA
Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2011/43]
Opponent(s)01  07.09.2011  21.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour L'étude et L'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Opponent's representative
Mercey, Fiona Susan
L'Air Liquide SA, Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
17.10.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.04.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.05.2012Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
05.07.2012Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
06.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.2013Reply to a communication from the opposition division
24.06.2014Date of oral proceedings
09.07.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2018Reply to a communication from the opposition division
30.08.2018Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
09.09.2018Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/03]
Appeal following opposition17.09.2014Appeal received No.  T1931/14
19.11.2014Statement of grounds filed
21.02.2018Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
29.09.2008Appeal received No.  T2289/08
28.11.2008Statement of grounds filed
10.07.2009Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
21.02.2018Date of oral proceedings
26.02.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
08.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
12.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
06.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
12.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
11.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200507   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES04.02.2017
SE04.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
[2018/39]
Former [2018/07]SE04.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
Former [2018/01]SE04.02.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0793070  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 7, line 5 - line 48 * * page 6, line 38 - line 42; figure 3 *
International search[A]US4224045  (OLSZEWSKI WALTER J, et al);
 [A]US4421536  (MORI TATSUO [JP], et al);
 [A]US4785621  (ALDERSON EDGAR D [US], et al)
by applicantUS4328008
 US4052176
 US5526647
 US5265429
 US5437160