Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053354

EP1053354 - DIRECT DETECTION OF RNA MEDIATED BY REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE LACKING RNASE H FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.07.2003  [2003/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Digene Corporation
Suite 207, 9000 Virginia Manor Road
Beltsville, MD 20705 / US
[2000/47]
Inventor(s)01 / DE LA ROSA, Abel
6580 Ridgefield Drive
Alpharetta - Georgia 30005 / US
02 / COLLIER, Clayton, D.
13410 Ansel Terrace
Germantown - Maryland 20874-3487 / US
 [2001/06]
Former [2000/47]01 / DE LA ROSA, Abel
717 Kent Oaks Mews
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
02 / COLLIER, Clayton, D.
3021 Mozart Drive
Silver Spring, MD 20904 / US
Representative(s)Miles, John Stephen , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Miles, John Stephen , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date99905711.003.02.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999US02382
Priority number, dateUS1998002006706.02.1998         Original published format: US 20067
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940224
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053354
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:DIREKTER NACHWEIS DER RNS MITTELS REVERSTRANSKRIPTASE MIT FEHLENDER RNASE H FUNKTION[2000/47]
English:DIRECT DETECTION OF RNA MEDIATED BY REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE LACKING RNASE H FUNCTION[2000/47]
French:DETECTION DIRECTE DE L'ARN AU MOYEN D'UNE TRANSCRIPTASE INVERSE DEPOURVUE DE FONCTION RIBONUCLEASE H[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase24.08.2000National basic fee paid 
24.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
06.06.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9310263  (DGI INC [US]) [Y] 1-35 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPH04267897  ;
 [Y]WO9710364  (DGI INC [US]) [Y] 1-35 * page 23, line 2 - page 31, line 20 *;
 [Y]US5668005  (KOTEWICZ MICHAEL LESLIE [US], et al) [Y] 1-35 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2279954  (SECR DEFENCE [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9624694  (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0480289  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - "Detection of DNA or RNA without radioactive labelling - in which digitoxigenin in complementary DNA is detected by immuno:chemical method , after annealing", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 45, Database accession no. 92-368410, XP002104363 & JPH04267897 A 19920924 (MITSUBISHI KASEI CORP) [Y] 1-35 * abstract *