EP1053009 - USE OF HEREGULIN AS AN EPITHELIAL CELL GROWTH FACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION 100 Oakdale Campus 214 TIC Iowa City, IA 55242-5000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | ||
For all designated states University of Iowa Research Foundation 100 Oakdale Campus 214 TIC Iowa City, IA 55242-5000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLIWKOWSKI, Mark 42 Oak Creek Lane Iowa City, IA 94070 / US | 02 /
KERN, Jeffrey, A. 4344 Maier Avenue Iowa City, IA 52240 / US | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99905717.7 | 03.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999US02390 | Priority number, date | US19980020598 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: US 20598 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9939729 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1053009 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053009 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, A61K39/395, A61K38/17, A61K35/12, // (C07K14/475, 16:22, C12N15:12, C12P21:08) | [2000/47] | CPC: |
C07K16/22 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/4756 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US);
C12N2810/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG DES HEREGULINS ALS EPITHELZELLENWACHSTUMSFAKTOR | [2000/47] | English: | USE OF HEREGULIN AS AN EPITHELIAL CELL GROWTH FACTOR | [2000/47] | French: | UTILISATION DE L'HEREGULINE COMME FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DE CELLULE EPITHELIALE | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 22.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04022325.7 / EP1510579 | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Request for further processing for: | 14.12.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.01.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2004 | FI | 22.09.2004 | IT | 22.09.2004 | NL | 22.09.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | SE | 22.12.2004 | CY | 03.02.2005 | PT | 22.02.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 22.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5367060 (VANDLEN RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-20 * column W *; | [A]WO9615244 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1,8,10* the whole document *; | [X] - PATEL, N. V. ET AL, "Heregulin (HRG) and human epidermal receptor ( HER ) 2 and 3 are modulated during in vitro human lung growth and differentiation.", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE MEDICINE, (1997) VOL. 45, NO. 3, PP. 284A, XP002113357 [X] 1-6,8-20 * the whole document * |