Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053504

EP1053504 - SELF-DEVELOPING CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.04.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.05.2001 [2001/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
POLAROID CORPORATION
784 Memorial Drive
Cambridge, MA 02139-3589 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
Polaroid Corporation
784 Memorial Drive
Cambridge, MA 02139-3589 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DOUGLAS, Lawrence, M.
15 Crestwood Lane
South Easton, MA 02375 / US
02 / KIRBY, John, P.
39 Paul Street
Peabody, MA 01960 / US
03 / LAUNIE, Kenneth, J.
15 Salem Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
04 / SILVEIRA, Frank, S.
221 Chestnut Street
Wilmington, MA 01887 / US
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date99905768.004.02.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999US02495
Priority number, dateUS1998001837504.02.1998         Original published format: US 18375
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940484
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053504
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/47]
Search report(s)International search reportUS12.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP14.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G03B17/38, G03B17/50, G03B17/52
[2001/13]
Former International [2000/47]G03B17/38, G03B17/50
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/47]
TitleGerman:SELBSTENTWICKLUNGSKAMERA[2000/47]
English:SELF-DEVELOPING CAMERA[2000/47]
French:APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE A AUTO-DEVELOPPEMENT[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2000National basic fee paid 
04.08.2000Search fee paid 
04.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
03.04.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/22]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4194825  (FAUTH GUNTER [DE]) [Y] 1,4,10-12 * column 2 - column 6; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]DE2654500  (AGFA GEVAERT AG) [Y] 1,5,10-12 * page 7 - page 11; figures 1-12 *
International search[YP]US5838997  (DOUGLAS LAWRENCE M [US]);
 [Y]US5608477  (SHIMIZU MITSURU [JP], et al);
 [Y]US4542973  (JOHNSON BRUCE K [US], et al);
 [Y]US4332451  (ICHII HIROKAZU);
 [Y]US4165931  (FAUTH GUNTER [DE], et al);
 [Y]US3967297  (ELORANTA VAITO K, et al)