Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053390

EP1053390 - REGENERATION OF CATALYST/ABSORBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.01.2019
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EmeraChem Holdings, LLC
201 Perimeter Park Drive
Knoxville TN 37922 / US
[2016/36]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
GOAL LINE ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC
2045 East Vernon Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90058 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GUTH, Eugene, D.
1109 Miramonte Glen
Escondido, CA 92026 / US
02 / CAMPBELL, Larry, E.
11141 Outlet Drive
Knoxville, TN 37932 / US
03 / WAGNER, Gregory, J.
11141 Outlet Drive
Knoxville, TN 37932 / US
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang
Dreiköniggasse 10
89073 Ulm / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/35]Richards, John , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Temple Chambers
3-7 Temple Avenue
London EC4Y 0DA / GB
Former [2012/24]Richards, John , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Former [2000/47]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date99905772.204.02.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999US02506
Priority number, dateUS1998001872004.02.1998         Original published format: US 18720
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940299
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053390
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053390
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/00
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2016/35]
Former [2000/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  FR,  GB,  IE,  IT,  LI,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:REGENERATION EINES KATALYSATORS/ABSORBERS[2000/47]
English:REGENERATION OF CATALYST/ABSORBER[2000/47]
French:REGENERATION DE CATALYSEUR/ABSORBEUR[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2000National basic fee paid 
28.08.2000Search fee paid 
28.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
11.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2013Observations by third parties
21.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2016Fee for grant paid
22.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.05.2017  02.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Ring 2
38440 Wolfsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Rössler, Matthias, et al
Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
(Karo IP Professionals)
Postfach 32 01 02
40416 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2018/26]
Former [2018/10]
Opponent(s)01  18.05.2017  02.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Ring 2
38440 Wolfsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Rössler, Matthias, et al
Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 32 01 02
40416 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2017/26]
Opponent(s)01  18.05.2017   
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Ring 2
38440 Wolfsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
KNH Patentanwälte
Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine
PartG mbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
04.07.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.11.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
31.01.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.01.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.02.2019Appeal received No.  T0557/19
Request for further processing for:26.09.2007Request for further processing filed
26.09.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.10.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 18
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200305   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
IE04.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
GB03.02.2019
[2019/21]
Former [2018/13]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
IE04.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
Former [2017/12]AT31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[YD]US5599758  (GUTH EUGENE D [US], et al) [YD] 1 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 7 *;
 [Y]JPS62106826  ;
 [Y]JPS62117620
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 25, Database accession no. 1987-174713, XP002234844 & JPS62106826 A 19870518 (NIPPON SHOKUBAI KAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 27, Database accession no. 1987-188551, XP002234845 & JPS62117620 A 19870529 (NIPPON SHOKUBAI KAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]US5599758  (GUTH EUGENE D [US], et al);
 [A]US5607650  (DEBBAGE LAWRENCE [US], et al);
 [A]US5538697  (ABE FUMIO [JP], et al);
 [AP]US5715677  (WALLMAN P HENRIK [US], et al)
ExaminationEP0814242
 EP0658370
otherEP0814242
 EP0658370
OppositionUS5599758
 JPS62106826
 EP0814242
 EP0658370
 US5406790
    - Martin J. Heimrich, "Demonstration of Lean NOx Catalytic Converter Technology on a Heavy-Duty Diesel Engine", SAE INTERNATIONAL IN UNITED STATES Technical Paper, 970755, (19970224), ISSN 0148-7191, pages 39 - 49, XP002912111