Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051767

EP1051767 - SUPPORTED ELECTROLYTE MEMBRANE COMPRISING CERAMIC COMPOSITE AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/46]CERAMIC COMPOSITE ELECTROLYTIC DEVICE
[2007/47]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IGR ENTERPRISES, INC.
23293B Commerce Park Road
Beachwood, OH 44122 / US
[2008/19]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
IGR ENTERPRISES, INC.
23293B Commerce Park Road
Beachwood, OH 44122 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CUBUKCU, Esin
9725 Weathertop Lane
Auburn, OH 44023 / US
02 / DAHAR, Steve
7060 Longview
Solon, OH 44139 / US
03 / DODEJA, Ravi, S.
5231 Austen Lane
Richmond Heights, OH 44143 / US
04 / GORDON, Arnold, Z.
23714 Woodway
Beachwood, OH 44122 / US
05 / KALYNCHUK, Daniel, G.
2431 Saybrook Road
University Heights, OH 44118 / US
06 / PRINCE, Troy, Shannon
4987 Hollyview Drive
Vermilion, OH 44089 / US
07 / SOLTESZ, Justin, M.
7313 Beach Road
Wadsworth, OH 44281 / US
08 / WAITE, Michael
20749 Parkwood Lane
Strongsville, OH 44136 / US
09 / CHAWLA, Sandeep
23351 Chagrin Boulevard 304
Beachwood, OH 44122 / US
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Neill, Alastair William , et al
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax
West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Neill, Alastair William , et al
Appleyard Lees & Co. 15 Clare Road
Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date99905804.305.02.1999
[2000/46]
WO1999US02556
Priority number, dateUS1998002020406.02.1998         Original published format: US 20204
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940643
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1051767
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1051767
Date:07.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/10, H01M8/12, H01M8/24
[2005/20]
Former International [2000/46]H01M8/10, H01M8/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
TitleGerman:GETRÄGERTE ELEKTROLYTMEMBRAN AUS KERAMISCHEM KOMPOSIT UND VORRICHTUNG[2007/47]
English:SUPPORTED ELECTROLYTE MEMBRANE COMPRISING CERAMIC COMPOSITE AND DEVICE[2007/47]
French:MEMBRANE À ÉLECTROLYTE SUPPORTÉ COMPRENANT COMPOSITE CÉRAMIQUE ET DISPOSITIF[2007/47]
Former [2000/46]ELEKTROLYTISCHE VORRICHTUNG AUS KERAMISCHEM KOMPOSIT
Former [2000/46]CERAMIC COMPOSITE ELECTROLYTIC DEVICE
Former [2000/46]DISPOSITIF ELECTROLYTIQUE CERAMIQUE COMPOSITE
Entry into regional phase17.08.2000National basic fee paid 
17.08.2000Search fee paid 
17.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
08.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2008Fee for grant paid
20.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.05.2008
BE07.05.2008
CY07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IT07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
LU05.02.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/25]AT07.05.2008
BE07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IT07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
LU05.02.2009
Former [2010/06]AT07.05.2008
BE07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IT07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/12]AT07.05.2008
BE07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/08]AT07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
Former [2009/07]AT07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
Former [2008/49]AT07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
ES18.08.2008
Former [2008/47]ES18.08.2008
Documents cited:Search[E]WO9929930  (IGR ETS INC [US]) [E] 1-5 * claims 1-5 * * pages 7-15 * * figures 4-12,15,16,30-33 *;
 [A]WO9200934  (IGR ETS INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 38, line 8 - page 40, line 15 * * figures 13,14,16 *;
 [A]EP0668622  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-5 * column 9, line 34 - column 11, line 10 * * figures 7,8 *
International search[A]US5332483  (GORDON ARNOLD Z [US]);
 [A]US5069987  (GORDON ARNOLD Z [US]);
 [A]US5312700  (ISHIDA YOSHIHIKO [JP]);
 [A]US5273837  (AITKEN BRUCE G [US], et al);
 [A]US4764488  (SAITO MAKOTO [JP], et al);
 [A]US5624542  (SHEN YOUSHENG [US], et al)