Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1080303

EP1080303 - FUEL INJECTOR HAVING DIFFERENTIAL PISTON FOR PRESSURIZING FUEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation
2400 Executive Hills Drive
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2980 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/11]For all designated states
Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation
2400 Executive Hills Drive
Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
Siemens Automotive Corporation
2400 Executive Hills Drive
Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LORRAINE, Jack, R.
11712 Jefferson Avenue, Suite C-222
Newport News, VA 23606 / US
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Allen, Derek
Siemens Group Services Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Siemens House
Oldbury, Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Allen, Derek
Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Siemens House Oldbury Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Former [2001/10]Allen, Derek
Siemens Shared Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Application number, filing date99905889.409.02.1999
[2001/10]
WO1999US02746
Priority number, dateUS1998005592706.04.1998         Original published format: US 55927
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9951871
Date:14.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1080303
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999
[2001/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1080303
Date:14.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/16]
Search report(s)International search reportEP14.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:F02M49/02, F02M51/06, F02M57/02
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/10]
TitleGerman:KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL MIT DIFFERENTIALKOLBEN ZUR KRAFTSTOFFDRUCKERZEUGUNG[2001/10]
English:FUEL INJECTOR HAVING DIFFERENTIAL PISTON FOR PRESSURIZING FUEL[2001/10]
French:INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT DOTE D'UN PISTON DIFFERENTIEL POUR LA PRESSURISATION DU CARBURANT[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2000National basic fee paid 
22.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
19.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2003Fee for grant paid
12.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT14.04.2004
[2008/17]
Cited inInternational search[A]FR1141566  (BESSIÈRE) [A] 1,2,5,6,9 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 3; figure . *;
 [A]US2332909  (OTTAVIO FUSCALDO) [A] 1,2,5,6 * page 3, column L, line 51 - column R, line 39; figure 3 *;
 [DA]US4197996  (GIARDINI DANTE S [US]) [DA] 1,5 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 30; figures 1,2 *
by applicantUS4197996