Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053176

EP1053176 - AIRCRAFT AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM INCLUDING AC POWER GENERATION WITH A LIMITED FREQUENCY RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARTINIAN, Vatche
5377 E. Appian Way
Long Beach, CA 90803 / US
02 / BRIM, Terry
2509 Ralston Lane
Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US
03 / MATULICH, Dan
5017 Range Horse Lane
Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274 / US
04 / MURRY, Roger
618 W. 38th Street
San Pedro, CA 90731 / US
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Finnie, Peter John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Finnie, Peter John
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/47]Sturm, Christoph
Honeywell Holding AG, Rechts- und Patentabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Application number, filing date99905956.111.02.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999US02992
Priority number, dateUS1998002210011.02.1998         Original published format: US 22100
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941145
Date:19.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053176
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053176
Date:16.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B64D13/06
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/47]
TitleGerman:LUFTFAHRZEUGSKLIMAANLAGE MIT WECHSELSTROMERZEUGUNG MIT BESCHRÄNKTEM FREQUENZBEREICH[2000/47]
English:AIRCRAFT AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM INCLUDING AC POWER GENERATION WITH A LIMITED FREQUENCY RANGE[2000/47]
French:SYSTEME DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR POUR AERONEF COMPRENANT UNE GENERATION D'ENERGIE EN COURANT ALTERNATIF A GAMME DE FREQUENCES LIMITEE[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase10.08.2000National basic fee paid 
10.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
01.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2002Fee for grant paid
16.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US5442905  (CLAEYS HENRY M [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5151022  (EMERSON TERENCE P [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PA]EP0888966  (BOEING NORTH AMERICAN INC [US]) [PA] 1 * abstract * * page 7, line 57 - page 8, line 58 * * figures 6,7 *;
 [A]US5056335  (RENNINGER STANTON W [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 25 *
by applicantUS19970987737