blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0968441 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0968441



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 158
31.03.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.04.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.02.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.02.2005 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
18.02.2005 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.12.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.12.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
06.12.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
22.11.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
22.11.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
22.11.2004 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.11.2004 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.11.2004 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
29.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
29.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
29.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
29.10.2004 Description Search / examination 2
29.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
27.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 12
25.10.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.10.2004 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.10.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
21.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
18.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
12.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
08.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 5
10.08.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.08.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.08.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.08.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.08.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.08.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
18.08.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.04.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
15.04.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.08.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.08.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
29.07.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
13.07.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
13.07.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 13
12.04.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
17.03.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
17.03.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 2
17.03.1999 Description International Searching Authority 8
17.03.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
17.03.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 1