blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0968441


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.06.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2007  [2007/30]
15.12.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.01.2007  [2007/03]
31.03.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.05.2006  [2006/20]
08.04.2005 (Expected) grant published on  25.05.2005  [2005/21]
02.03.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.03.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.01.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.11.2004 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.08.2004 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
24.01.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.08.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.04.2003 First examination report
11.04.2003 Examination report or reply
13.01.2003 Renewal fee
08.01.2002 Renewal fee
20.12.2000 Renewal fee
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
19.11.1999 Request for examination filed published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
10.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication