blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0968441
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001515601Global Dossier 18.09.2001A
Priority number Date
DE9900038 13.01.1999
DE19801617 17.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0968441Global Dossier 25.05.2005B1
EP0968441 05.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE9900038 13.01.1999
DE19801617 17.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT296452T 15.06.2005T
Priority number Date
DE9900038 13.01.1999
DE19801617 17.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59912081D 30.06.2005D1
Priority number Date
DE9900038 13.01.1999
DE59912081 13.01.1999
DE19801617 17.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6266005 24.07.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE9900038 13.01.1999
DE19801617 17.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9936796Global Dossier 22.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19801617 17.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19801617 22.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19801617 17.01.1998