Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968441

EP0968441 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING RADAR SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 25.07.2007  [2007/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEIDER, Robert
Eichenweg 19
D-89233 Neu-Ulm / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Straub, Bernd
Daimler AG Intellectual Property Management, Sedanstr. 10 / Geb. 17
89077 Ulm / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Straub, Bernd
DaimlerChrysler AG, Intellectual Property Managament Sedanstr. 10 / Geb. 17
89077 Ulm / DE
Application number, filing date99906043.713.01.1999
[2000/01]
WO1999DE00038
Priority number, dateDE199810161717.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19801617
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9936796
Date:22.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968441
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968441
Date:25.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/42
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/01]
TitleGerman:RADARSIGNAL-VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN[2000/01]
English:METHOD FOR PROCESSING RADAR SIGNALS[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX RADAR[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase12.08.1999National basic fee paid 
12.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
15.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2004Date of oral proceedings
22.11.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2005Fee for grant paid
18.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.01.2006
CH31.01.2006
LI31.01.2006
[2007/30]
Former [2007/03]CH31.01.2006
LI31.01.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]US5241317  (HOWARD DEAN D [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 7 *;
 [A]US4595925  (HANSEN JAMES P [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]  - M.I. SKOLNIK, Introduction to Radar Systems, SINGAPORE, MCGRAW-HILL, XP002103542 [X] 1 * page 546, line 6 - line 14 *
ExaminationUS5633705
 WO9927384