EP0998365 - PENDULUM SAW WITH A CUTTING TABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGELFRIED, Uwe Bopserweg 31 D-73760 Ostfildern / DE | 02 /
AGLASSINGER, Peter Olgastrasse 16 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | 03 /
KEUSCH, Siegfried Zehntstrasse 30 D-73779 Deizisau / DE | [2000/19] | Application number, filing date | 99906046.0 | 14.01.1999 | [2000/19] | WO1999DE00048 | Priority number, date | DE1998103955 | 03.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19803955 | [2000/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939858 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998365 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0998365 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23D49/08, B23D59/00 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
B23D59/006 (EP);
B23D49/08 (EP);
B23D59/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/19] | Title | German: | HUBSÄGE MIT KAPPTISCH | [2000/19] | English: | PENDULUM SAW WITH A CUTTING TABLE | [2000/19] | French: | SCIE A MOUVEMENT ALTERNATIF AVEC TABLE DE COUPE | [2000/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 06.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 08.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE6929900U (STEINE UND ERDEN G M B H [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]DE3733454 (FETZER GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 57; figures 1,2 * [A] 5; | [A]US3574315 (BOULTINGHOUSE ACE C) [A] 4-7 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 4; figure - *; | [A]US3998121 (BENNETT JAMES C) [A] 4,5,7,8 * column 5, line 1 - line 20; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5560273 (KEDDIE DAVID P [US]) [A] 9 * column 5, line 45 - line 52; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5279198 (CROSS RAYMOND E [US]) [A] 10 * column 3, line 18 - line 20; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US1898956 (ELDRIDGE HARVIE WALTER); | [A]DE4410804 (WOLFER HELMUT DIPL ING FH [DE], et al); | [A]DE1930127 (ROUX PIERRE); | [A]US3572409 (HOFFMAN SIMON J) |