Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971852

EP0971852 - GUIDING ROLLER FOR WEB MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  16.08.2002
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 02.10.2002  [2002/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stowe Woodward AG
Hellweg 184-194
33758 Schloss Holte-Stukenbrock / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / NIEMEYER, Friedel
Jahnstrasse 21
D-49328 Melle / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Thielking, Bodo , et al
Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Thielking, Bodo, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date99906135.116.01.1999
[2000/03]
WO1999EP00223
Priority number, dateDE199810455305.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19804553
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940007
Date:12.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971852
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65H27/00
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:LEITWALZE FÜR BAHNMATERIAL[2000/03]
English:GUIDING ROLLER FOR WEB MATERIAL[2000/03]
French:ROULEAU-GUIDE POUR MATERIAU SOUS FORME DE BANDE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase26.08.1999National basic fee paid 
26.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
02.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
30.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/40]
10.05.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0679596  (VOITH SULZER FINISHING GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE3311095  (WITTLER H GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH06263300  ;
 [A]JPH06277734  ;
 [A]JPH06263301
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941216), vol. 018, no. 669, Database accession no. (M - 1725), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 095, no. 001, [A] 1 * abstract *