Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1056759

EP1056759 - 2-(PURIN-9-YL) -TETRAHYDROFURAN-3, 4-DIOL DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 27.10.2004  [2004/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CHAN, Chuen
Glaxo Wellcome plc Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
02 / COOK, Caroline Mary, Glaxo Wellcome plc
Gunnels Wood Road, Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
03 / COX, Brian
Glaxo Wellcome plc Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
04 / COUSINS, Richard Peter C., Glaxo Wellcome plc
Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NSG1 2NY / GB
05 / DYKE, Hazel Joan, Chiroscience Limited
Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB
06 / ELLIS, Frank Glaxo Wellcome plc
Gunnels Wood Road, Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
07 / GEDEN, Joanna V., OSI Pharm.(AstonMolecules)
10 Hnolt Court South, Aston Science Park
Birmingham B7 4EJ / GB
08 / SWANSON, Stephen Glaxo Wellcome plc
Gunnels Wood Road, Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
09 / BAYS, David
9 Windmill Field Ware
Hertfordshire SG12 9PE / GB
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Teuten, Andrew John
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Teuten, Andrew John
Glaxo Wellcome plc, Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
Application number, filing date99906229.212.02.1999
[2000/49]
WO1999EP00915
Priority number, dateGB1998000316914.02.1998         Original published format: GB 9803169
GB1998001353323.06.1998         Original published format: GB 9813533
[2000/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941267
Date:19.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1056759
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1056759
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/16, A61K31/70
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/49]
Extension statesAL25.07.2000
LT25.07.2000
LV25.07.2000
MK25.07.2000
RO25.07.2000
SI25.07.2000
TitleGerman:2-(PURIN-9-YL)-TETRAHYDROFURAN-3,4-DIOL-DERIVATIVE[2000/49]
English:2-(PURIN-9-YL) -TETRAHYDROFURAN-3, 4-DIOL DERIVATIVES[2000/49]
French:DERIVES DE 2-(PURINE-9-YL) -TETRAHYDROFURANNE-3, 4-DIOL[2000/49]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2000National basic fee paid 
25.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
22.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
26.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2002Fee for grant paid
11.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE04.12.2002
CY12.02.2003
[2004/44]
Former [2003/14]SE04.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9602553  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,21-23,25,27-29 * page 1, line 3 - page 2, line 8 * * page 8, line 10 - line 29 *;
 [PA]WO9828319  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PA] 1,21-25,27-29 * claims 1,17,18,22-26,30,32 *
 [A]  - KOBE J ET AL, "PREPARATION AND UTILITY OF 5-BETA-D-RIBOFURANOSYL-1H-TETRAZOLE AS A KEY SYNTHON FOR C-NUCLEOSIDE SYNTHESIS", NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (19940101), vol. 13, no. 10, pages 2209 - 2244, XP002064181 [A] 1,25,27-29 * figures 3-6 *
 [A]  - HENNEN, WILLIAM J. ET AL, "Synthesis of 5-(.beta.-D-ribofuranosyl)-1,2,4-oxadiazole-3-carboxamide", J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM. (1985), 22(6), 1747-8, XP002107414 [A] 1,29 * page 1747, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 1747, column L, paragraph L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570220656