Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1058580

EP1058580 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FISCHER-TROPSCH CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/50]PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HYDROCARBONS FROM A SYNTHESIS GAS, AND CATALYSTS THEREFOR
[2003/29]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Database last updated on 25.08.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2016New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sasol Technology (Proprietary) Limited
1 Sturdee Avenue, Rosebank 2196 Johannesburg
Transvaal / ZA
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
Sasol Technology (Proprietary) Limited
1 Sturdee Avenue, Rosebank
2196 Johannesburg, Transvaal / ZA
Former [2000/50]For all designated states
Sasol Technology (Proprietary) Limited
1 Sturdee Avenue, Rosebank
2196 Johannesburg, Transvaal / ZA
For all designated states
SASOL CHEMICALS EUROPE LIMITED
1 Hockley Court, 2401 Stratford Road, Hockley Heath
Solihull, West Midlands B94 6NW / GB
Inventor(s)01 / VAN BERGE, Peter, Jacobus
4 Keiskamma Avenue
Vaalpark, Sasolburg / ZA
02 / VAN DE LOOSDRECHT, Jan
1 Schubert Street
Vanderbijlpark / ZA
03 / CARICATO, Elsie, Adriana
24 Osothuizen Street
Sasolburg / ZA
04 / BARRADAS, Sean
18 Casa Caryl Den
Vanderbijlpark / ZA
[2000/50]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/17]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2000/50]Ablewhite, Alan James
MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99906328.219.02.1999
[2000/50]
WO1999GB00527
Priority number, dateZA1998000144020.02.1998         Original published format: ZA 9801440
ZA1998001188228.12.1998         Original published format: ZA 9811882
[2000/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9942214
Date:26.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1058580
Date:13.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1058580
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP26.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01J33/00, B01J23/75, C07C1/04, B01J37/02
[2000/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   PT,   SE [2000/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FISCHER-TROPSCH KATALYSATOREN[2003/29]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FISCHER-TROPSCH CATALYSTS[2003/29]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CATALYSEURS FISCHER-TROPSCH[2003/29]
Former [2000/50]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN AUS SYNTHESEGAS UND KATALYSATOREN DAFÜR
Former [2000/50]PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HYDROCARBONS FROM A SYNTHESIS GAS, AND CATALYSTS THEREFOR
Former [2000/50]PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES HYDROCARBURES A PARTIR D'UN GAZ DE SYNTHESE ET CATALYSEURS UTILISES A CET EFFET
Entry into regional phase11.08.2000National basic fee paid 
11.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
16.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2002Date of oral proceedings
21.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
21.10.2002Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2003Fee for grant paid
17.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02022186.7   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 05.11.2002
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.11.2004  10.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Formalities Bureau Limited
4 The Gatehouse, 2 High Street
HARPENDEN Herts, AL5 2TH / GB
Opponent's representative
Bawden, Peter Charles
Bawden & Associates
4 The Gatehouse
2 High Street
Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2005/01]
Opponent(s)01  02.11.2004  10.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Formalities Bureau Limited
4 The Gatehouse, 2 High Street
HARPENDEN Herts, AL5 2TH / GB
Opponent's representative
Bawden, Peter Charles
Bawden & Associates, 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street
Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB
09.12.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.06.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
29.10.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.10.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
Appeal following opposition29.12.2008Appeal received No.  T0022/09
02.03.2009Statement of grounds filed
05.02.2016Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
05.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
PT04.07.2004
IT19.02.2014
ES20.02.2014
[2016/29]
Former [2015/23]AT04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
PT04.07.2004
ES20.02.2014
Former [2008/17]AT04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
PT04.07.2004
Former [2005/02]AT04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
Former [2004/44]AT04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
Former [2004/43]AT04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
Former [2004/41]FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0141596
 [A]EP0586196
 [A]WO9720216
 [A]US5169821
Examination US4708945
  EP0736326
by applicant EP1058580