Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1061966

EP1061966 - ABSORBENT MEMBERS COMPRISING A HIGH SURFACE AREA MATERIAL FOR ABSORBING BODY LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/44]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YOUNG, Gerald, Alfred
1101 Hearthstone Drive
Cincinnati, OH 45231 / US
02 / DESMARAIS, Thomas, Allen
10204 Scull Road
Cincinnati, OH 45252 / US
03 / PALUMBO, Gianfranco
Mühlstrasse 23
D-65760 Eschborn / DE
04 / SCHMIDT, Mattias
Charlotte-Rosenthal-Str. 21
D-65510 Idstein / DE
05 / GOLDMAN, Stephen, Allen
Via Colle di Moro, 62
I-65013 Citta S. Angelo / IT
06 / ASHRAF, Arman
1581 Napoleon Lane
Cincinnati, OH 45240 / US
07 / HORNEY, James, Cameron
2865 LaFeuille Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45211 / US
 [2001/05]
Former [2000/52]01 / YOUNG, Gerald, Alfred
1101 Hearthstone Drive
Cincinnati, OH 45231 / US
02 / DESMARAIS, Thomas, Allen
10204 Scull Road
Cincinnati, OH 45252 / US
03 / PALUMBO, Gianfranco
Georgenfeld 7
D-61348 Bad Homburg / DE
04 / SCHMIDT, Mattias
Altkoenigweg 3
D-65510 Idstein / DE
05 / GOLDMAN, Stephen, Allen
Via Colle di Moro, 62
I-65013 Citta S. Angelo / IT
06 / ASHRAF, Arman
1581 Napoleon Lane
Cincinnati, OH 45240 / US
07 / HORNEY, James, Cameron
2865 LaFeuille Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45211 / US
Representative(s)Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]Hirsch, Uwe Thomas , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date99906376.112.03.1999
[2000/52]
WO1999IB00405
Priority number, dateUS1998004193013.03.1998         Original published format: US 41930
[2000/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9947184
Date:23.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1061966
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1061966
Date:27.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Search report(s)International search reportEP23.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/60, A61F13/15
[2000/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/52]
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDE ELEMENTE AUS EINEM MATERIAL MIT GROSSER OBERFLÄCHE ZUR AUFNAHME VON KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEITEN[2004/22]
English:ABSORBENT MEMBERS COMPRISING A HIGH SURFACE AREA MATERIAL FOR ABSORBING BODY LIQUIDS[2000/52]
French:ELEMENTS ABSORBANTS COMPRENANT UN MATERIAU DE SUPERFICIE ELEVEE PERMETTANT D'ABSORBER LES LIQUIDES CORPORELS[2000/52]
Former [2000/52]Absorbierende Elemente aus einem Material mit grosser Oberfläche zur Aufnahme von Körperflüssigkeiten
Entry into regional phase08.10.2000National basic fee paid 
08.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
14.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2004Fee for grant paid
25.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
FI27.10.2004
IT27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
NL27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
SE27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
CY12.03.2005
LU12.03.2005
IE14.03.2005
PT27.03.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2007/26]AT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
FI27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
NL27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
SE27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
CY12.03.2005
LU12.03.2005
IE14.03.2005
Former [2007/22]AT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
FI27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
NL27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
SE27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
CY12.03.2005
IE14.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
Former [2006/24]AT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
FI27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
NL27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
IE14.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
FI27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
NL27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2005/51]AT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
FI27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2005/46]AT27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
FI27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2005/36]AT27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
FI27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2005/27]CH27.10.2004
FI27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2005/26]CH27.10.2004
FI27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
GR27.01.2005
Former [2005/25]CH27.10.2004
FI27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
Former [2005/24]FI27.10.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US5647863  (HAMMONS JOHN L [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,18;
 [Y]US5318554  (YOUNG GERALD A [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,18;
 [X]US5260345  (DESMARAIS THOMAS A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,18