blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0991992


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2006  [2006/12]
17.12.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.02.2005  [2005/05]
03.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.10.2004  [2004/43]
26.12.2003 (Expected) grant published on  11.02.2004  [2004/07]
06.12.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.12.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.11.2003 Change - German title published on  07.01.2004  [2004/02]
06.05.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.04.2003 Change - oral proceedings
09.04.2003 Renewal fee
21.03.2003 Change - German title published on  07.05.2003  [2003/19]
19.12.2002 Change - oral proceedings
11.11.2002 Examination report or reply
26.07.2002 First examination report
24.07.2002 Examination report or reply
23.07.2002 Examination report or reply
22.04.2002 Renewal fee
11.04.2001 Renewal fee
23.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  09.08.2000 [2000/32]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
22.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
26.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
15.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
02.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication