blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0991992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4011637BGlobal Dossier 21.11.2007B2
JP2002511222 09.04.2002A
Priority number Date
EP98890087 27.03.1998
IB9900434 15.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0991992Global Dossier 11.02.2004B1
EP0991992 12.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
EP99906398 15.03.1999
EP98890087 27.03.1998
IB9900434 15.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT259513T 15.02.2004T
Priority number Date
EP98890087 27.03.1998
IB9900434 15.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69914692T 21.10.2004T2
DE69914692D 18.03.2004D1
Priority number Date
EP98890087 27.03.1998
IB9900434 15.03.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9950738Global Dossier 09.12.1999A3
WO9950738 07.10.1999A2
Priority number Date
EP98890087 27.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6595414 22.07.2003B1
Priority number Date
EP98890087 27.03.1998