blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0991992

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 11.02.2004
 DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 NLLapse: 11.02.2004
Examination procedure24.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase27.12.1999National basic fee paid 
27.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted11.02.2004
Opposition procedure12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 26.01.2005 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT DE FR GB NL
 
Event date:09.08.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000609
 
Event date:11.09.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020729
 
Event date:07.05.2003 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:CIRCUIT FOR PASSIVE DATA CARRIER REDUCING THE POWER CONSUMPTION
 
Event date:11.02.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040211
 
Event date:11.02.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040211
 
Event date:11.02.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT DE FR GB NL
 
Event date:11.02.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:10.03.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 746
Code Expl.: REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)
Effective DATE:20040213
 
Event date:18.03.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69914692
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20040318
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:02.08.2004 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT
 
Event date:05.11.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:14.01.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR D6
Code Expl.: PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS
 
Event date:02.02.2005 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20041112
 
Event date:03.01.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:20.04.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:03.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130606 AND 20130612
 
Event date:19.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:21.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:20.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180226
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180219
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180220
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:15.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69914692 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:03.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20190314
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20190314