Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991992

EP0991992 - CIRCUIT FOR PASSIVE DATA CARRIER REDUCING THE POWER CONSUMPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/15]PASSIVE DATA CARRIER HAVING MEANS FOR REDUCING THE POWER CONSUMPTION
[2003/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 22.03.2006  [2006/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / EBER, Wolfgang
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / THÜRINGER, Peter
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Weber, Helmut , et al
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property Triester Strasse 64
1101 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Weber, Helmut , et al
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property Triester Strasse 64
1101 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date99906398.515.03.1999
[2000/15]
WO1999IB00434
Priority number, dateEP1998089008727.03.1998         Original published format: EP 98890087
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9950738
Date:07.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991992
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991992
Date:11.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F7/06, G06F1/32
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/15]
TitleGerman:SCHALTUNG FÜR DATENTRÄGER ZUM REDUZIEREN VON STROMVERBRAUCH[2004/02]
English:CIRCUIT FOR PASSIVE DATA CARRIER REDUCING THE POWER CONSUMPTION[2003/19]
French:CIRCUIT POUR CARTE PORTABLE COMPRENANT DES MOYENS DE REDUCTION DE LA CONSOMMATION D'ENERGIE[2003/19]
Former [2000/15]PASSIVER DATENTRÄGER MIT VORRICHTUNG ZUM REDUZIEREN VON STROMVERBRAUCH
Former [2000/15]PASSIVE DATA CARRIER HAVING MEANS FOR REDUCING THE POWER CONSUMPTION
Former [2000/15]PORTEUSE DE DONNEES PASSIVE COMPRENANT DES MOYENS DE REDUCTION DE LA CONSOMMATION D'ENERGIE
Entry into regional phase27.12.1999National basic fee paid 
27.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
29.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2003Date of oral proceedings
02.05.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2003Fee for grant paid
24.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.02.2004
NL11.02.2004
[2006/12]
Former [2004/43]AT11.02.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US5286955  (KLOSA KLAUS [DE]);
 [Y]US5449894  (BRUHNKE MICHAEL [DE], et al);
 [A]US5345231  (KOO ROLAND [AT], et al);
 [A]EP0666527  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US])