Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0985223

EP0985223 - ELECTRIC LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:SE 
PHILIPS AB
Kottbygatan 7
Kista
164 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:SE 
PHILIPS AB
Kottbygatan 7, Kista
164 85 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHOLLER, Klaus
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99906403.315.03.1999
[2000/11]
WO1999IB00442
Priority number, dateEP1998020096026.03.1998         Original published format: EP 98200960
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9949498
Date:30.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0985223
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0985223
Date:04.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01K1/32, // (H01J61/35, B60Q1:04)
[2000/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/11]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHE LAMPE[2000/11]
English:ELECTRIC LAMP[2000/11]
French:LAMPE ELECTRIQUE[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase27.12.1999National basic fee paid 
27.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
12.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2004Fee for grant paid
07.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH04.08.2004
FI04.08.2004
LI04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
PT04.01.2005
CY15.03.2005
IE15.03.2005
LU15.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2007/26]CH04.08.2004
FI04.08.2004
LI04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
CY15.03.2005
IE15.03.2005
LU15.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/22]CH04.08.2004
FI04.08.2004
LI04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
CY15.03.2005
IE15.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/24]CH04.08.2004
FI04.08.2004
LI04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
IE15.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]CH04.08.2004
FI04.08.2004
LI04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
MC31.03.2005
Former [2005/22]CH04.08.2004
FI04.08.2004
LI04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
Former [2005/21]CH04.08.2004
FI04.08.2004
LI04.08.2004
GR04.11.2004
Former [2005/18]FI04.08.2004
GR04.11.2004
Former [2005/11]FI04.08.2004
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0561701  (VALEO VISION [FR]);
 [Y]EP0354620  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al);
 [A]US5111105  (YAMAMOTO TERUAKI [JP]);
 [A]GB2064217  (GTE PROD CORP);
 [A]SE359964  (PHILIPS NV);
 [A]DE3040812  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE])