Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055345

EP1055345 - SERVER REQUEST INCLUDING CODE FOR CUSTOMIZING SERVICE TO REQUESTING CELLULAR MOBILE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2008
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / SKOG, Bengt, Robert
Töjnavägen 39 B
S-191 34 Sollentuna / SE
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia
Torhamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2005/17]Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Core Networks, Kista
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/02]Sjöberg, Mats Hakan , et al
Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/16]Wennerholm, Kristian , et al
Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/48]Wennerholm, Kristian , et al
Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date99906610.326.01.1999
[2000/48]
WO1999SE00104
Priority number, dateUS1998002221711.02.1998         Original published format: US 22217
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941931
Date:19.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055345
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055345
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/48]
TitleGerman:SERVERANFRAGE BEI ZELLULARER MOBILFUNKSTATION MIT CODE ZUR DIENSTLEISTUNGSPERSONALISIERUNG[2000/48]
English:SERVER REQUEST INCLUDING CODE FOR CUSTOMIZING SERVICE TO REQUESTING CELLULAR MOBILE STATION[2000/48]
French:DEMANDE DE SERVEUR COMPRENANT UN CODE D'ADAPTATION DE SERVICE A UNE STATION MOBILE CELLULAIRE DEMANDEUR[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2000National basic fee paid 
17.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
17.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
08.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.05.2007
30.05.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
01.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2007Fee for grant paid
10.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07109392.6  / EP1821567
EP07109423.9  / EP1821568
Opposition(s)04.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0685972  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1-4,7,8,11-14,17,20-23,26 * column 2, line 3 - line 27 * * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 34 * * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 30 * * column 8, line 19 - line 36 * * column 9, line 8 - line 38 * [Y] 5,6,9,10,15,16,18,19,24,25;
 [Y]WO9620572  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 5,6,9,10,15,16,18,19,24,25 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 29 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]WO9701942  (MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [A] 6,10,16,18,25 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 14 * * page 14, line 18 - line 23 *