Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053381

EP1053381 - Door as well as method for assembling a door [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/47]DOOR AS WELL AS METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A DOOR
[2004/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.01.2006  [2006/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOMAFA AB
P.O. Box 509
305 94 Halmstad / SE
[2000/47]
Inventor(s)01 / BENGTSSON, Mikael
Norra Dalabygget
S-310 31 Eldsberga / SE
02 / LARSSON, Hakan
Malstensvägen 8
S-302 59 Halmstad / SE
03 / FRIDOLFSSON, Pär
Parkgatan 10
S-312 40 Genevad / SE
04 / STRANDH, Nils
Vilshärads Ljungväg 27
S-310 41 Gullbrandstorp / SE
05 / PALSSON, Kent
Nivavägen 12
S-313 50 Aled / SE
 [2005/02]
Former [2004/33]01 / BENGTSSON, Mikael
Norra Dalabygget
S-310 31 Eldsberga / SE
02 / LARSSON, Hakan
Malstensvägen 8
S-302 59 Halmstad / SE
03 / FRIDOLFSSON, Pär
Parkgatan 10
S-312 40 Genevad / SE
04 / STRANDH, Nils
Vilshärads Ljungväg 27
S-310 41 Gullbrandstorp / SE
05 / PALSSON, Kent
Niv vägen 12
S-313 50 Aled / SE
Former [2000/47]01 / BENGTSSON, Mikael
Norra Dalabygget
S-310 31 Eldsberga / SE
02 / LARSSON, H kan
Malstensvägen 8
S-302 59 Halmstad / SE
03 / FRIDOLFSSON, Pär
Parkgatan 10
S-312 40 Genevad / SE
04 / STRANDH, Nils
Vilshärads Ljungväg 27
S-310 41 Gullbrandstorp / SE
05 / PALSSON, Kent
Niv vägen 12
S-313 50 led / SE
Representative(s)Berglund, Gustav Arthur , et al
Awapatent AB Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Berglund, Gustav Arthur , et al
AWAPATENT AB, Berga Allé 1
254 52 Helsingborg / SE
Application number, filing date99906634.304.02.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999SE00143
Priority number, dateSE1998000036806.02.1998         Original published format: SE 9800368
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9940287
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053381
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053381
Date:12.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/44, E06B3/80, E06B9/06
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:Tür sowie Methode zum Zusammenbau einer Tür[2004/31]
English:Door as well as method for assembling a door[2004/31]
French:Porte et procède d'assemblage d'une porte[2004/31]
Former [2000/47]TÜR SOWIE METHODE ZUM ZUSAMMENBAU EINER TÜR
Former [2000/47]DOOR AS WELL AS METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A DOOR
Former [2000/47]PORTE ET PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE PORTE
Entry into regional phase29.07.2000National basic fee paid 
29.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
29.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
24.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2004Fee for grant paid
12.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0412857  (NERGECO SA [FR]);
 [A]US3857433  (GATZI W);
 [A]FR2545871  (NERGECO SA [FR]);
 [A]WO9015913  (SCHOFIELD PAUL SPENCER [GB]);
 [A]SE454526  (DUBBELMAN VOLDEMAR, et al);
 [A]FR2722531  (MAVIL [FR]);
 [A]FR2706941  (CLEVER [FR]);
 [A]EP0113634  (KRAEUTLER BERNARD)