Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1066134

EP1066134 - ABRASIVE TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2003  [2003/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTON COMPANY
1 New Bond Street, Box No. 15138 Worcester
Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
NORTON COMPANY
1 New Bond Street, Box No. 15138
Worcester, Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RAMANATH, Srinivasan
28 Avery Road
Holden, MA 01520 / US
02 / WILLISTON, William, H.
37 Donald Avenue
Holden, MA 01520 / US
03 / BULJAN, Sergej-Tomislav
23 Washington Drive
Acton, MA 01720 / US
 [2001/02]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]Zimmermann & Partner
Postfach 33 09 20
80069 München / DE
Application number, filing date99906733.304.02.1999
[2001/02]
WO1999US02399
Priority number, dateUS1998004962327.03.1998         Original published format: US 49623
US1998021884422.12.1998         Original published format: US 218844
[2001/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9948646
Date:30.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1066134
Date:10.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999
[2001/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1066134
Date:08.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/19]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1066134
Date:13.11.2002
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search reportEP30.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:B24D5/06, B24D3/08
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/02]
TitleGerman:SCHLEIFWERKZEUGE[2001/02]
English:ABRASIVE TOOLS[2001/02]
French:OUTILS ABRASIFS[2001/02]
Entry into regional phase19.09.2000National basic fee paid 
19.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/02]
19.12.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
25.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.04.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
20.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2001Fee for grant paid
27.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[PA]JPH10138150  ;
 [A]JPS61152374  ;
 [A]US4259089  (WAIZER WALTER, et al) [A] 1 * column A *;
 [A]JPH03256674  ;
 [DA]US5607489  (LI ROUNAN [US]) [DA] 1 * claim - *;
 [DA]US3925035  (KEAT PAUL P) [DA] 1 * claim - *
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 098, no. 010, [PA] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861128), vol. 010, no. 353, Database accession no. (M - 539), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920213), vol. 016, no. 057, Database accession no. (M - 1210), [A] 1 * abstract *