Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1057022

EP1057022 - ASSAY FOR SPECIFIC STRAINS OF MULTIPLE DISEASE RELATED CONFORMATIONS OF A PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 30.05.2007  [2007/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street
Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PRUSINER, Stanley, B.
400 Pacheco Street
San Francisco, CA 94116 / US
02 / SAFAR, Jiri, G.
1003 Stimel Drive
Concord, CA 94518 / US
03 / COHEN, Fred, E.
767 Rhode Island Street
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Goldin, Douglas Michael
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Goldin, Douglas Michael
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99906769.705.02.1999
[2000/49]
WO1999US02580
Priority number, dateUS1998002695720.02.1998         Original published format: US 26957
US1998015105710.09.1998         Original published format: US 151057
[2000/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9942829
Date:26.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1057022
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1057022
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/53, G01N33/566, G01N33/537, G01N33/543
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/49]
TitleGerman:ASSAY FÜR SPEZIFISCHE STÄMME VON MIT MEHREREN KRANKHEITEN ZUSAMMENHÄNGENDEN PROTEINKONFORMATIONEN[2000/49]
English:ASSAY FOR SPECIFIC STRAINS OF MULTIPLE DISEASE RELATED CONFORMATIONS OF A PROTEIN[2000/49]
French:DOSAGE POUR SOUCHES SPECIFIQUES DE CONFORMATIONS D'UNE PROTEINE RELATIVES A PLUSIEURS MALADIES[2000/49]
Entry into regional phase14.08.2000National basic fee paid 
14.08.2000Search fee paid 
14.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
09.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2003Fee for grant paid
07.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
CY09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
IE05.02.2004
LU05.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
[2007/22]
Former [2005/23]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
IE05.02.2004
LU05.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/19]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
IE05.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/02]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
MC28.02.2004
Former [2004/29]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/28]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/22]AT09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/16]AT09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/14]AT09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
GR09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI09.07.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/12]FI09.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9837411  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [PX] 1-11 * claim - *;
 [DE]WO9942487  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [DE] 1-11 *see abstract and claims*;
 [PA]US5757361  (HIRSHIK ANDREW S [US]) [PA] 1-11 * claims 20-23 *;
 [A]WO9323432  (UNIV NEW YORK [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 12-16 *;
 [DA]WO9531466  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [DA] 1-11 * claim - *
 [A]  KASCSAK R J ET AL, "THE ROLE OF ANTIBODIES TO PRP IN THE DIAGNOSIS OF TRANSMISSIBLE SPONGIFORM ENCEPHALOPATHIES", DEVELOPMENTS IN BIOLOGICAL STANDARDIZATION,CH,BASEL, (1993), vol. 80, pages 141 - 151, XP002036865 [A] 1-11 * page 141 *
 [A]  NGUYEN J ET AL, "PRION PROTEIN PEPTIDES INDUCE ALPHA-HELIX TO BETA-SHEET CONFORMATIONAL TRANSITIONS", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), pages 4186 - 4192, XP002071225 [A] 1-11 * page 4190 - page 4191 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00013a006
 [A]  GIOIA DE L ET AL, "CONFORMATIONAL POLYMORPHISM OF THE AMYLOIDOGENIC AND NEUROTOXIC PEPTIDE HOMOLOGOUS TO RESIDUES 106-126 OF THE PRION PROTEIN", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, (19940318), vol. 269, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 7859 - 7862, XP000887214 [A] 1-11 * page 7859 *
 [A]  PRUSINER S B ET AL, "IMMUNOLOGIC AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGIC STUDIES OF PRION PROTEINS IN BOVINE SPONGIFORM ENCEPHALOPATHY", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES,US,CHICAGO, IL, (19930301), vol. 167, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 602 - 613, XP002036867 [A] 1-11 * page 602 *
International search[A]US4806627  (WISNIEWSKI HENRYK M [US], et al);
 [A]US5565186  (PRUSINER STANLEY B [US], et al);
 [YP]US5891641  (PRUSINER STANLEY B [US], et al)