Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1070410

EP1070410 - AUTOMATIC SPEED DETECTION FOR ASYNCHRONOUS SERIAL COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson, Inc.
7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 23969
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
[2001/04]
Inventor(s)01 / PETTY, Jack, S.
374 Wesley Court
Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US
02 / McCAULEY, Kevin
435 Yarmouth Road
Raleigh, NC 27608 / US
03 / SORCE, William
209 Sandhurst Road
Raleigh, NC 27615 / US
04 / QUINN, David
20 Reith Drive
East Kilbride G75 9AB / GB
 [2001/04]
Representative(s)Vigars, Christopher Ian
Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol
BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]Vigars, Christopher Ian
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99906816.609.02.1999
[2001/04]
WO1999US02706
Priority number, dateUS1998003987616.03.1998         Original published format: US 39876
[2001/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9948244
Date:23.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1070410
Date:24.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999
[2001/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1070410
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Search report(s)International search reportEP04.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/02, G06F13/38
[2001/04]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/04]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE RATENERKENNUNG FÜR ASYNCHRONE SERIELLE KOMMUNIKATION[2001/04]
English:AUTOMATIC SPEED DETECTION FOR ASYNCHRONOUS SERIAL COMMUNICATIONS[2001/04]
French:DETECTION AUTOMATIQUE DE LA VITESSE POUR COMMUNICATIONS SERIE ASYNCHRONES[2001/04]
Entry into regional phase04.10.2000National basic fee paid 
04.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
01.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2004Fee for grant paid
29.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
FR26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
GB09.02.2005
[2006/14]
Former [2006/13]BE26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
GB09.02.2005
Former [2005/14]BE26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE26.08.2004
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5206888  (HIRAGUCHI MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,14,15,17 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 9 * * column 2, line 40 - line 60 * * column 3, line 7 - line 10 * * column 3, line 22 - line 31 * * column 3, line 46 - line 55 * * column 4, line 27 - line 49 * [Y] 4,5,9,11,12,16;
 [XAY]US5222081  (LEWIS RONALD C [US], et al) [X] 6-8,13-15,17,18 * abstract * * column 4, line 23 - line 36 * * column 4, line 40 - line 42 * * column 4, line 49 - line 52 * * column 5, line 3 - line 14 * [A] 1-3 [Y] 4,11,12;
 [XA]US5627858  (MAK SIMON C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,14,15,17 * abstract * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, line 20 - line 34 * * column 6, line 50 - line 66 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 11 * * column 5, line 20 - line 34 * * column 6, line 50 - line 58 * * column 50, line 62 - line 66 * [A] 4,5,9,11-13,16,18;
 [A]EP0364720  (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 1,6,14 * abstract * * page 10, line 20 - line 33 * * page 14, line 5 - line 10 *
 [Y]  - WEGENER A W, "PRACTICAL TECHNIQUES FOR BAUD RATE ESTIMATION", DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING 1, SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 23 - 26, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920323), vol. 4, no. CONF. 17, pages IV-681 - IV-684, XP000467286 [Y] 5,9,16 * page 682, column R, line 40 - line 44 * * page 683, column L, line 8 - line 20 *