EP1054733 - HOUSING FOR RECEPTACLE FILLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NL TECHNOLOGIES, LIMITED Post Office Box 1001 Gambrills Maryland 21054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states NL TECHNOLOGIES, LIMITED Post Office Box 1001 Gambrills, Maryland 21054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWBERG, Douglas 37 Ashford Drive Plainsboro NJ 08536 / US | 02 /
NEWBERG, Richard, R. 806 Hedge Hopper Lane Gambrills, MD 21054 / US | [2004/13] |
Former [2000/48] | 01 /
NEWBERG, Douglas 803 Hedge Hopper Lane Gambrills, MD 21054 / US | ||
02 /
NEWBERG, Richard, R. 806 Hedge Hopper Lane Gambrills, MD 21054 / US | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 99906842.2 | 10.02.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999US02781 | Priority number, date | US19980074205P | 10.02.1998 Original published format: US 74205 P | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939828 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1054733 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01L1/00, B01L11/00 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
G01N1/2035 (EP,US);
G01N1/10 (EP,US);
G01N2001/1037 (EP,US);
G01N2001/2071 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US);
Y10T436/2575 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/48] | Title | German: | GEHAUSE ZUM FÜLLEN EINES REZIPIENTEN | [2000/48] | English: | HOUSING FOR RECEPTACLE FILLING | [2000/48] | French: | STRUCTURE PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER LE REMPLISSAGE D'UN RECIPIENT | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   05.04.2007 | 28.02.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3383923 (FRANCOIS CONCHE, et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]DE3043836 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED [CS]) [A] 1-20 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US5296197 (NEWBERG DOUGLAS A [US], et al); | [A]US5372782 (KARKANTIS PETER N [US], et al); | [X]US5409841 (CHOW TIMOTHY [US]); | [A]US5525301 (NEWBERG DOUGLAS A [US], et al); | [AP]US5786209 (NEWBERG DOUGLAS A [US]) |